Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY & ST MATTHIAS, TULSE HILL

Charity number: 1133884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £261.16k £284.62k £305.22k £247.69k £234.88k
Total expenditure £212.76k £419.75k £176.78k £240.18k £234.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £710
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A