Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY & ST MATTHIAS, TULSE HILL
Charity number: 1133884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RICHARD PAUL DORMANDY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amy Louise Grant | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Sutcliffe | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Zebida Aysha Gardner-Sharper | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Patricia Humphreys | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Robertson | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Ava Serunjogi | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yetunde Akintunde | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Odusina | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE ALEXANDER HEMI JAMES LOBBAN | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA OTU-SIMON | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Lyon | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS GEORGIE SNYDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV WILLIAM SHARPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS FAY MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM HUGH DAVID KEMP | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID JOHN JOWSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADAM JOHN WEST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.