Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY & ST MATTHIAS, TULSE HILL

Charity number: 1133884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window