PCC of Birstall Parish Church in the Diocese of Leeds

Charity number: 1133854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAYMOND GALLAGHER Trustee None on record
Margaret Susan Charlton Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Margaret Susan Bell Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Jonathan Paul Keer Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
LEIF ALARIC WILKS Trustee None on record
John EARNSHAW Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Miles Wilfred Crawford LAWSON Trustee 07 April 2019
BIRSTALL ST PETER'S PARISH CHARITIES Received: On time
DAVID STUART BARKER Trustee None on record
William Edward Land Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
ANDY RHODES Trustee 19 July 2011 None on record
Patricia Lynne CAUNT Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
ALISON SOWDEN Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
Alan GRAVES Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
DENISE GOSLING Trustee
BIRSTALL ST PETER'S PARISH CHARITIES Received: On time
Janice Mary Mitchell Trustee 09 September 2019 None on record
Chris TAYLOR Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Wendy HARPER Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record