Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, SOUTHBROOM, DEVIZES

Charity number: 1134059
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window