UNITED REFORMED CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1133373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time Download