Financial history UNITED REFORMED CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1133373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £26.48m £25.60m £27.01m £23.25m £34.09m
Total expenditure £25.03m £23.86m £23.26m £22.92m £24.08m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £20.04m £20.61m £20.98m £19.38m £27.23m
Income - Other trading activities £777.00k £744.00k £788.00k £279.00k £285.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.35m £1.55m £1.42m £1.23m £1.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.69m £1.84m £1.88m £1.95m £1.95m
Income - Other £2.63m £862.00k £1.94m £415.00k £3.38m
Income - Legacies £322.00k £1.04m £811.00k £339.00k £80.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £24.26m £23.21m £22.60m £22.52m £24.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £548.00k £599.00k £651.00k £399.00k £80.00k
Expenditure - Governance £343.00k £424.00k £242.00k £191.00k £505.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £708.00k £704.00k £105.00k £630.00k £648.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £223.00k £50.00k £0 £0 £0