PETERBOROUGH MUSLIM EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1136767
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 December 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 December 2021 60 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 March 2021 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 March 2021 130 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 November 2017 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 November 2017 12 days late Download