THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PETER, BURY ST EDMUNDS

Charity number: 1134666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN MARK DIXON Trustee 23 April 2017
MUSIC FOR YOUTH Received: On time
Duncan William MacInnes Trustee 01 December 2015 None on record
Dr Stuart Shepherd Lowe Trustee 31 January 2021 None on record
Rev Andrew Williams Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Brian Read Jones Trustee 28 June 2021 None on record
PETER DAVID BOYT Trustee None on record
Rev Simon John Harvey Chair 04 February 2019
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
Rev Laura Elizabeth Hodgkinson Pope Trustee 27 June 2020 None on record
VIRGINIA BEVERLEY DEAN Trustee 29 April 2019
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
NIGEL JOHN BEETON Trustee None on record
IAN NURCOMBE Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
JACKIE POST Trustee None on record
REVEREND DAVID CROFTS Trustee None on record
Dorothy Haile Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
DAVID LESLIE AYRTON Trustee 24 April 2016
AID TO THE BALKANS UK (A2B) Received: On time
Andrew James Gayfer Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Dr Philip Martin Lloyd-Jones Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
ROBIN IAN GOODCHILD Trustee 15 July 2017 None on record
COLIN ARTHUR FIRTH Trustee
CHARITY OF JOHN SUTTON FOR THE VICAR OF ST MARY, BURY ST EDMUNDS Received: On time
SHELAGH WALLACE Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record