Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL, WYLDE GREEN

Charity number: 1135805
Charity reporting is overdue by 227 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 December 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 November 2022 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window