Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL, WYLDE GREEN

Charity number: 1135805
Charity reporting is overdue by 234 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steve James Tomlinson Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Karen Monaghan Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Victoria Linney Trustee 07 April 2019
FRIENDS OF THE DEANERY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
Emma Louise Ellen Brett Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Jane Catherine Gotschel Trustee 14 November 2013
None on record
Mandy Jane Cryan Trustee 22 April 2013
BIRMINGHAM NURSERY SCHOOLS COLLABORATION
Received: On time
MARION BERNICE SNOWDON Trustee 26 July 2012
None on record
VERA JOYCE SMART CERT ED Trustee 16 June 2011
LITTLE ASTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
KELVIN ROBIN GARDINER AMIMI Trustee 16 June 2011
None on record
Richard Howard Mason Trustee
THE SUTTON COLDFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
ROYAL SUTTON COLDFIELD COMMUNITY TOWN HALL TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SHAW Trustee
None on record
GLYN NORMAN ARMSTRONG Trustee
None on record