THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BOTOLPH-WITHOUT-BISHOPSGATE

Charity number: 1135985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 October 2017 On time Download