Financial history LIVING HEALTH AND EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1138227
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/10/2016 10/10/2017 10/10/2018 10/10/2019 10/10/2020
Total gross income £5.85k £5.36k £3.22k £3.46k £3.92k
Total expenditure £4.75k £4.76k £2.85k £2.95k £2.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A