BASO-THE ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER SURGERY

Charity number: 1136067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 02 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 23 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 February 2017 On time Download