BASO-THE ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER SURGERY

Charity number: 1136067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jim Khan Trustee 04 November 2018 None on record
HASSAN MALIK FRCS Chair 07 December 2012 None on record
Professor MICHAEL DOUEK FRCS Trustee 14 November 2011 None on record
Zaed Hamady Trustee 02 November 2015 None on record
Aaron Quyn Trustee 23 November 2020 None on record
Professor Richard Shaw Trustee 04 November 2018 None on record
Professor Derek Michael Manas Trustee 04 November 2018 None on record
Professor Jayant Vaidya Trustee 17 November 2019 None on record
JOHN LEE WHITING Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
Anant Desai Trustee 23 November 2020 None on record
Edmund Leung Trustee 04 November 2017 None on record
MICHAEL SHACKCLOTH FRCS Trustee 06 December 2012 None on record