BASO-THE ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER SURGERY

Charity number: 1136067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £61.68k £84.76k £87.48k £99.60k £122.45k
Total expenditure £81.28k £76.78k £89.30k £102.18k £165.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A