Accounts and annual returns THE ECUMENICAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST ANDREW'S PSALTER LANE CHURCH, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1137529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 02 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window