Financial history THE ECUMENICAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST ANDREW'S PSALTER LANE CHURCH, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1137529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £153.84k £139.39k £149.57k £142.36k £166.71k
Total expenditure £131.49k £144.20k £135.77k £146.29k £143.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.40k N/A