Accounts and annual returns UK HOMES 4 HEROES PRIDE AND PASSION LTD

Charity number: 1138073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 27 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 14 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 14 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window