"WE THE CHANGE" FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137870
Charity reporting is overdue by 942 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £27.04k £24.70k £26.83k £22.67k £20.49k
Total expenditure £21.38k £28.50k £24.76k £26.69k £22.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0