LIFE CHURCH (EUROPE)

Charity number: 1138461
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 November 2021 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 November 2021 125 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 September 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 September 2020 84 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 November 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 November 2019 14 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 October 2017 On time Download