Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET ROTTINGDEAN

Charity number: 1138715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £173.78k £204.75k £166.56k £95.20k £284.81k
Total expenditure £137.49k £127.26k £224.53k £115.05k £152.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £3.00k N/A