Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET ROTTINGDEAN

Charity number: 1138715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Sparks Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
William Woodhouse Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Mary Hanna Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
John Michael Laslett Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
Kerwin Hack Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
Dawn Teresa Davidson Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Michael Maddox OBE Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
THE REV'D DR ANTHONY MOORE Trustee 21 February 2017
None on record
MR BERNIE CLARK Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
DUNCAN WARD Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
HEATHER MAE BUTLER Trustee 02 May 2013
GLADRAGS COMMUNITY COSTUME TRUST
Received: On time
SUSAN ELIZABETH LEANEY Trustee 27 August 2012
None on record
LORNA ANN COLEMAN Trustee 24 August 2012
None on record