COVENTRY UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION LIMITED

Charity number: 1139462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 21 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 08 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 07 June 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 07 June 2017 7 days late Download