Trustees COVENTRY UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION LIMITED
Charity number: 1139462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Anne Clements | Chair | 03 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Panchami Satheesh | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Akhil Sha | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aparna Golla | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Reszka | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Callary | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Maria Gloria Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Robinson | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
LARRY COLTMAN | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||
HUGH JAMES HUNT | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Furrkh Aslam | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.