COVENTRY UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION LIMITED

Charity number: 1139462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.68m £2.00m £2.52m £3.08m £3.30m
Total expenditure £1.65m £1.97m £2.44m £3.01m £3.04m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.40m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £275.14k £298.63k £473.03k £490.40k £426.13k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.70m £2.05m £2.59m £2.87m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £236 £113 £0 £170 £838
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.36m £1.73m £1.99m £2.59m £2.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £292.92k £234.68k £441.11k £424.28k £459.20k
Expenditure - Governance £14.62k £15.13k £16.14k £16.33k £16.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0