Accounts and annual returns STUDENTS' UNION ROYAL HOLLOWAY UNIVERSITY OF LONDON

Charity number: 1141998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 09 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 11 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 04 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window