STUDENTS' UNION ROYAL HOLLOWAY UNIVERSITY OF LONDON

Charity number: 1141998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MS Jane Broadbent Trustee 08 June 2017 None on record
Maia Jarvis Trustee 09 July 2021 None on record
Alexander Parry Trustee 09 July 2021 None on record
Zhoufang Wei Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
Thomas George Ridge Trustee 08 July 2020 None on record
Rory Shanks Trustee 04 February 2021 None on record
Henriette Warwick Chair 08 July 2020 None on record
Alice Goode Trustee 09 July 2021 None on record
Peter Elliot Trustee 08 June 2017
WINDSOR AND ETON CHORAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Professor Justin O'Brien Trustee 23 September 2021 None on record
Gemma Parson Trustee 09 July 2021 None on record
Remigiusz Gruszka Trustee 13 January 2020 None on record