Financial history STUDENTS' UNION ROYAL HOLLOWAY UNIVERSITY OF LONDON

Charity number: 1141998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £5.77m £6.83m £6.74m £5.88m £3.31m
Total expenditure £4.67m £6.06m £6.78m £5.94m £3.64m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £488.74k £441.58k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.85m £1.61m £921.44k £1.29m £0
Income - Other trading activities £17.68k £22.02k £48.72k £14.85k £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.86m £5.17m £5.73m £4.09m £2.87m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £49.20k £23.49k £35.80k £492.27k £441.58k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.63m £6.02m £6.74m £5.89m £3.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.76k £44.03k £44.04k £47.29k £0
Expenditure - Governance £42.89k £51.37k £17.97k £19.18k £15.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0