BARNSLEY INDEPENDENT ALZHEIMER'S AND DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity number: 1140201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara White Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
JAKE ROLLIN Trustee 27 February 2013 None on record
PETER FRANCIS Chair None on record
James Burgess Trustee 18 October 2017 None on record
LISA PHELAN Trustee None on record
Neil Wright Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
SUSAN HAUGHTON Trustee None on record
Lynette Webber Trustee 29 October 2018 None on record
DAVID COUPLAND Trustee 20 September 2017
YORKSHIRE MINERS' WELFARE CONVALESCENT HOMES Received: On time
DODWORTH MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME Received: On time
PETER MOODY Trustee 27 February 2013 None on record
Anne Ackers Trustee 14 January 2015 None on record