BAILIFF BRIDGE COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1139333
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 09 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 16 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 16 December 2016 On time Download