Accounts and annual returns SPEAKERS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1139377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window