Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1139578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window