THE BRIZEN YOUNG PEOPLE'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1143826
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required