LONDON YOUTH CONSERVATOIRE

Charity number: 1141138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 14/07/2016 14/07/2017 14/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £326.69k £329.40k £348.98k £387.47k £416.35k
Total expenditure £306.26k £317.24k £327.30k £361.08k £366.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A