LONDON YOUTH CONSERVATOIRE

Charity number: 1141138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATERINA HOEY Trustee 11 July 2013 None on record
Josephine Dufouleur Trustee 03 July 2017 None on record
FABIENNE NACOUZI Trustee 01 May 2013 None on record
KATHLEEN DEVITT Chair 04 July 2019 None on record
NATALIE LINDSAY Trustee 17 October 2016 None on record
Barbara Anderson Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
FLORENCE QUATTROCCHI Trustee 01 December 2014 None on record