LONDON YOUTH CONSERVATOIRE

Charity number: 1141138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 26 May 2020 On time
Annual return 14 July 2018 14 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2018 14 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 14 July 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2017 12 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 14 July 2016 11 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2016 11 April 2017 On time Download