Financial history LEICESTER SHRI MURUGAN (HINDU) TEMPLE

Charity number: 1141315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £22.13k £22.97k £22.31k £19.35k £21.36k
Total expenditure £21.18k £22.26k £21.85k £17.59k £16.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A