Trustees LEICESTER SHRI MURUGAN (HINDU) TEMPLE

Charity number: 1141315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LAIYAN THULANGANATHAN Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
POOBALASINGHAM GUNABALASINGHAM Trustee 13 November 2014
None on record
SOORIYAKUMAR MARKANDU Trustee 12 November 2014
None on record
MAHENDRARAJAH THILLAINATHAN Trustee 12 November 2014
None on record
KRISHNAPILLAI KARUNASEGAR Trustee 12 November 2014
None on record
SELLVATHAMBY PASKARAN Trustee 14 July 2014
None on record
RASIAH PUNITHARAJAH Trustee 12 July 2014
None on record
BASKARAN NADASAN Trustee 24 June 2014
None on record
NAGULESPARAN SANDRASEGARAM Trustee 20 June 2014
None on record
SELLATHAMBY MANIVANNAN BSC Trustee 03 June 2014
None on record