DAUGHTERS OF DIVINE LOVE TRAINING AND ASSESSMENT CENTRE (UK)

Charity number: 1146021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 26 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 13 February 2017 47 days late Download