Financial history KERALA ARTS AND LITERARY ASSOCIATION (KALA)

Charity number: 1144122
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.41k £44.51k £25.87k £18.01k £21.45k
Total expenditure £22.22k £41.71k £22.34k £8.72k £16.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A