Accounts and annual returns KERALA ARTS AND LITERARY ASSOCIATION (KALA)

Charity number: 1144122
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required