Trustees NOTTINGHAM SOCIETY OF ARTISTS LTD

Charity number: 1143205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rita Mary Mitchell Trustee 08 January 2022
None on record
Gillian Ann Salter Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Roger Crooks Trustee 21 November 2020
None on record
Philip Scott Harrison Trustee 08 June 2019
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Sirkett Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
John Michael Pooler Trustee 06 June 2015
None on record
Alan Herrick Gardner Trustee 07 June 2014
None on record
COLIN TRELIVING Trustee 18 August 2013
None on record