FRIENDS OF KENSAL RISE LIBRARY LIMITED

Charity number: 1141606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 October 2017 On time Download