Accounts and annual returns MARY LIDSTONE TRUST

Charity number: 1143031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 October 2021 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 October 2021 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 January 2020 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 07 January 2020 191 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window