THE HINCKLEY CONCORDIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 501904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £262.99k £295.57k £291.19k £275.61k £229.35k
Total expenditure £256.52k £243.54k £271.96k £257.67k £217.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k