Financial history GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE

Charity number: 1142297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £5.56m £5.48m £5.61m £6.21m £6.62m
Total expenditure £5.74m £5.73m £8.16m £6.79m £7.38m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £998.00k £1.02m £791.00k £763.00k £1.40m
Income - Other trading activities £144.00k £0 £0 £285.00k £98.00k
Income - Charitable activities £3.28m £3.27m £3.18m £3.20m £3.31m
Income - Endowments £17.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.16m £1.02m £1.44m £1.71m £1.67m
Income - Other £0 £173.00k £206.00k £252.00k £139.00k
Income - Legacies £981.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.45m £5.52m £7.99m £6.59m £7.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £258.00k £211.00k £132.00k £203.00k £150.00k
Expenditure - Governance £5.45m £0 £25.00k £25.00k £2.47m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £1.00k
Expenditure - Other £29.00k £0 £41.00k £0 £40.00k