Trustees GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE

Charity number: 1142297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

42 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof Denise Lievesley CStat CBE Chair 01 October 2015
KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL
Received: On time
Dr Alison Stenton Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Dr Tim Clayden Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
John Webster Trustee 01 May 2017
VINCENT'S APPEAL TRUST COMPANY
Received: On time
THE TEMPLETON EDUCATION AND CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
Professor Gary Ford Trustee 01 June 2016
PICKER INSTITUTE EUROPE
Received: On time
DR Marella De Bruijn Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL KLENERMAN Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
DR Michael Smets Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
DR Susan James Relly Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
SIR TOM SHEBBEARE Trustee 08 November 2013
CHINA EXCHANGE (UK)
Received: On time
Elizabeth Jane Padmore Trustee 08 November 2013
THE DITCHLEY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE STAFF COLLEGE: LEADERSHIP IN HEALTHCARE
Received: On time
THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY
Received: On time
WINCHESTER HOSPICE FUNDRAISING CHARITY
Received: On time
IAN LAING Trustee 08 November 2013
MONTE SAN MARTINO TRUST
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ST MICHAELS AND ALL SAINTS CHARITY
Received: On time
Professor Sarah Darby Trustee 08 November 2013
None on record
Professor Mary Daly Trustee 08 November 2013
None on record
Professor Harry Daniels Trustee 08 November 2013
None on record
Professor Richard McManus Trustee 23 October 2013
None on record
Andrew White Trustee 01 October 2013
STREET CHILD
Received: On time
PROF SUE DOPSON Trustee 07 June 2011
THE SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF ORGANISING FOR HEALTH CARE (SSOHC)
Received: On time
Sir Professor Richard Peto Trustee 07 June 2011
THE SANJAYA LALL MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Professor ELISABETH HSU Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
PROF DAME VALERIE BERAL Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
Dr REBECCA SURENDER Trustee 07 June 2011
THE OXFORD PLAYHOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
Professor JAMES WORRELL Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
PROF KEITH HAWTON Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
Dr LAURENCE LEAVER Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
Dr RAFAEL RAMIREZ Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
PROF. SHOUMO BHATTACHARYA Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
Dr MARC THOMPSON Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
Dr XIAOLAN FU Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
PROF. NEIL MORTENSEN Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
Professor CAROLYN HOYLE Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
Dr FELIX REED-TSOCHAS Trustee 07 June 2011
None on record
Professor RICHARD GIBBONS Trustee 27 May 2011
None on record
Dr RICHARD CUTHBERTSON Trustee 27 May 2011
None on record
PROF PETER FRIEND Trustee 27 May 2011
None on record
Professor STEPHEN TUCKER Trustee 27 May 2011
None on record
PROF. TIM MORRIS Trustee 27 May 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR STEPHEN KENNEDY Trustee 27 May 2011
None on record
PROF MARK HARRISON Trustee 27 May 2011
THE MUSEUM OF MILITARY MEDICINE TRUST
Received: 1 day late
Dr David Cranston Trustee 27 May 2011
THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR MISSION STUDIES
Received: On time
Jonathan Reynolds Trustee 27 May 2011
BART'S CITY LIFE SAVER
Received: On time
David Levy Trustee 27 May 2011
ASYLUM WELCOME
Received: On time
THE CONVERSATION TRUST (UK) LIMITED
Received: On time