Accounts and annual returns QUINTESSENTIALLY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1144584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 January 2018 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 January 2018 73 days late Download Open in new window