Financial history QUINTESSENTIALLY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1144584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.96m £2.13m £1.30m £1.11m £690.99k
Total expenditure £1.95m £2.15m £1.36m £1.10m £746.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.89k £394 £2.22k £40.71k £39.52k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.13m £1.30m £1.07m £651.47k
Income - Charitable activities £1.96m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.02k £22 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.57m £1.14m £923.94k £762.89k £654.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds £383.88k £1.01m £432.56k £333.66k £92.64k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £19.76k £34.34k £25.14k £27.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.12m £889.60k £737.76k £626.92k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0